TX HB1218 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the distribution of benefits under the supplemental nutrition assistance program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the distribution of benefits under the supplemental nutrition assistance program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - Read 3rd time RV#87 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24 Effective immediately
2019-05-24 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-14 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-14SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-13HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-10HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-10HouseSenate passage reported
2019-05-10SenateRecord vote
2019-05-10SenatePassed
2019-05-10SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-10SenateRecord vote
2019-05-10SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-10SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-10SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-10SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-05-10SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-01SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-01SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-01SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-04-30SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-23SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-23SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-23SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-23SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-01SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2019-04-01SenateRead first time
2019-03-27SenateReceived from the House
2019-03-26HouseReported engrossed
2019-03-26HouseRecord vote RV#87
2019-03-26HousePassed
2019-03-26HouseRead 3rd time
2019-03-25HousePassed to engrossment
2019-03-25HouseRead 2nd time
2019-03-25HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-03-21HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-03-18HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-03-18HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-03-15HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-12HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-03-12HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-05HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-05HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-05HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-05HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-26HouseReferred to Human Services
2019-02-26HouseRead first time
2019-01-30HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB582 (Same As) 2019-02-21 - Referred to Health & Human Services

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback