TX HB1221 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-15 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House International Relations & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-15 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House International Relations & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to authorizing certain projects to be undertaken by economic development corporations.
Title
Relating to authorizing certain projects to be undertaken by economic development corporations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-15 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-15 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-26 | House | Referred to International Relations & Economic Development |
2019-02-26 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-30 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1890 (Same As) 2019-03-18 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Subjects
City Government
City Government--General
DEVELOPMENT CORPORATIONS
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
Elections
Elections--General
Safety
Taxation
Taxation--Sales
City Government--General
DEVELOPMENT CORPORATIONS
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
Elections
Elections--General
Safety
Taxation
Taxation--Sales
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1221 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01221I.htm |