TX HB123 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to personal identification documents for foster children or youth or homeless children or youth.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to personal identification documents for foster children or youth or homeless children or youth.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1762 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - Read 3rd time RV#84 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-29 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-26HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-25HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-23SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-23HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2019-05-23HouseRecord vote RV#1762
2019-05-23HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2019-05-21HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2019-05-21HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2019-05-21HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2019-05-20SenateRecord vote
2019-05-20SenatePassed
2019-05-20SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-20SenateRecord vote
2019-05-20SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-20SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-20SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-20SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-05-20SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-19SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2019-05-16SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-13SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-13SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-13SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-10SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-07SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-05-07SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-07SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-07SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-01SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2019-04-01SenateRead first time
2019-03-27SenateReceived from the House
2019-03-26HouseReported engrossed
2019-03-26HouseRecord vote RV#84
2019-03-26HousePassed
2019-03-26HouseRead 3rd time
2019-03-25HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-03-25HouseAmended 1-White
2019-03-25HouseRead 2nd time
2019-03-25HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-03-21HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-03-18HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-03-18HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-03-15HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-12HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-03-12HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-12HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-02-19HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-02-19HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-02-19HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-02-19HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-02-19HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-12HouseReferred to Human Services
2019-02-12HouseRead first time
2018-11-12HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB481 (Similar To) 2019-03-20 - Co-author authorized

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback