TX HB1231 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-07 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-07 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the prosecution of and punishment for the offense of unlawfully carrying a handgun by a license holder.
Title
Relating to the prosecution of and punishment for the offense of unlawfully carrying a handgun by a license holder.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Flynn [R] | Rep. Trent Ashby [R] | Rep. Tom Oliverson [R] | Sen. Phil King [R] |
Rep. Terry Wilson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-06 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-29 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-26 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2019-02-26 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-30 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB535 (Same As) 2019-06-07 - Effective on 9/1/19