TX HB1239 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-06 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-06 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a study by the Teacher Retirement System of Texas regarding the use of health reimbursement accounts in conjunction with certain Medicare plans to provide health benefit coverage for certain retired school employees.
Title
Relating to a study by the Teacher Retirement System of Texas regarding the use of health reimbursement accounts in conjunction with certain Medicare plans to provide health benefit coverage for certain retired school employees.
Sponsors
Sen. Tan Parker [R] | Rep. Lynn Stucky [R] | Rep. Ray Lopez [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#962 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-03 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-03 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-03 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-03 | House | Record vote RV#962 |
2019-05-03 | House | Passed |
2019-05-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-03 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-03 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-05-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-03 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-04-30 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-04-28 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-04-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-25 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-04-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-26 | House | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services |
2019-02-26 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-31 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2417 (Same As) 2019-03-21 - Referred to State Affairs