TX HB1243 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-22 - Placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-22 - Placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the allocation of certain revenue from mixed beverage gross receipts and sales taxes.
Title
Relating to the allocation of certain revenue from mixed beverage gross receipts and sales taxes.
Sponsors
Rep. Trent Ashby [R] | Rep. Four Price [R] | Rep. Joseph Moody [D] | Rep. J.D. Sheffield [R] |
Sen. Judith Zaffirini [D] | Sen. Robert Nichols [R] | Sen. Charles Perry [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#878 (Y: 137 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-22 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-02 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-02 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-02 | House | Record vote RV#878 |
2019-05-02 | House | Passed |
2019-05-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-01 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-05-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-29 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-25 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-15 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-15 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-26 | House | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-02-26 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-31 | House | Filed |
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
DRUG COURTS
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
Taxation
Taxation--Alcoholic Beverages
DRUG COURTS
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
Taxation
Taxation--Alcoholic Beverages