TX HB1264 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to pharmacist communications to prescribing practitioners regarding certain dispensed biological products.
Title
Relating to pharmacist communications to prescribing practitioners regarding certain dispensed biological products.
Sponsors
Rep. Senfronia Thompson [D] | Rep. John Zerwas [R] | Rep. Sarah Davis [R] | Rep. Donna Howard [D] |
Rep. Julie Johnson [D] | Rep. Diego Bernal [D] | Rep. J.D. Sheffield [R] | Sen. Dawn Buckingham [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#130 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#130 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | Effective immediately | |
2019-05-07 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-04-30 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-04-29 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-04-29 | House | Senate passage reported |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-02 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-02 | House | Record vote RV#130 |
2019-04-02 | House | Passed |
2019-04-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-01 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-01 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-03-27 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-03-25 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-03-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-03-22 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-20 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-03-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2019-02-27 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-31 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB759 (Same As) 2019-03-19 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PACKAGING & LABELING REQUIREMENTS
PHARMACIES & PHARMACISTS
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PACKAGING & LABELING REQUIREMENTS
PHARMACIES & PHARMACISTS