TX HB1277 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to authorizing a wellness and success center fee at the University of Houston-Downtown.
Title
Relating to authorizing a wellness and success center fee at the University of Houston-Downtown.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Perez [D] | Sen. Borris Miles [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1729 (Y: 123 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - Read 3rd time RV#320 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - Read 3rd time RV#320 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | Effective immediately | |
2019-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-26 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-25 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-23 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2019-05-23 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2019-05-23 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-23 | House | Record vote RV#1729 |
2019-05-23 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2019-05-17 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2019-05-17 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2019-05-17 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-12 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-12 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-12 | House | Record vote RV#320 |
2019-04-12 | House | Passed |
2019-04-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-12 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-12 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-12 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-12 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-03-27 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-03-26 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-03-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-26 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-03-26 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-03-26 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-03-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2019-02-27 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-01 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB507 (Same As) 2019-04-17 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Student Fees
UNIVERSITY OF HOUSTON SYSTEM
UNIVERSITY OF HOUSTON-DOWNTOWN
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Student Fees
UNIVERSITY OF HOUSTON SYSTEM
UNIVERSITY OF HOUSTON-DOWNTOWN