TX HB1278 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 55-29)
Status: Passed on June 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 55-29)
Status: Passed on June 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to financial assistance paid to the survivors of certain law enforcement officers, firefighters, and other public employees killed in the line of duty.
Title
Relating to financial assistance paid to the survivors of certain law enforcement officers, firefighters, and other public employees killed in the line of duty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-12 - House - HB 1278Third Reading House (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - House - SUSPEND NECESSARY RULES (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - House - SUSPEND NECESSARY RULES (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-17 | Effective on 9/1/15 | |
2015-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-28 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-27 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-27 | House | Senate passage reported |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-05-12 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-12 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-12 | House | Passed |
2015-05-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-11 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2015-05-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-08 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-07 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-07 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-05-09 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-20 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-03-26 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-03-26 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-03-25 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-03-23 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-03-23 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-03-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-16 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-16 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-03-16 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-03-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-16 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-03 | House | Referred to Pensions |
2015-03-03 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-10 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
Law Enforcement
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Fire Fighters & Police--General
Law Enforcement
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions