TX HB1311 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the continuation and functions of the Texas Board of Professional Geoscientists.
Title
Relating to the continuation and functions of the Texas Board of Professional Geoscientists.
Sponsors
Rep. Senfronia Thompson [D] | Rep. Dan Flynn [R] | Rep. Stan Lambert [R] | Rep. Chris Paddie [R] |
Rep. Poncho Nevarez [D] | Sen. Kirk Watson [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-05 - House - Read 3rd time RV#164 (Y: 111 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Read 2nd time RV#161 (Y: 121 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-05 - House - Read 3rd time RV#164 (Y: 111 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Read 2nd time RV#161 (Y: 121 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-05-14 | Filed without the Governor's signature | |
2019-05-02 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-02 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-01 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-01 | House | Senate passage reported |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-05 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-05 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-05 | House | Record vote RV#164 |
2019-04-05 | House | Passed |
2019-04-05 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-04 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-04 | House | Record vote RV#161 |
2019-04-04 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-04 | House | Placed on Major State Calendar |
2019-04-02 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-03-27 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-03-22 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-03-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-03-21 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-19 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-03-19 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-12 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-12 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-12 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-12 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures |
2019-02-27 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB609 (Same As) 2019-02-21 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Subjects
Governor
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
PROFESSIONAL GEOSCIENTISTS, TEXAS BOARD OF
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Sunset
Sunset--Commission Bills
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
PROFESSIONAL GEOSCIENTISTS, TEXAS BOARD OF
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Sunset
Sunset--Commission Bills