TX HB1312 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-22 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-22 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the provision of on-campus mental health services by a school district and reimbursement under Medicaid for certain services provided to eligible students.
Title
Relating to the provision of on-campus mental health services by a school district and reimbursement under Medicaid for certain services provided to eligible students.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-22 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-11 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-11 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-11 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-03-26 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2019-02-27 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2395 (Same As) 2019-03-21 - Referred to Education
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--School Districts
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--Child Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
MEDICAID
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--School Districts
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--Child Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
MEDICAID
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety