TX HB1346 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the eligibility requirements for the diesel emissions reduction incentive program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the eligibility requirements for the diesel emissions reduction incentive program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1702 (Y: 121 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#608 (Y: 141 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-06-10 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-26 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-25SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-24HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-23HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-22SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-22HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2019-05-22HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22HouseRecord vote RV#1702
2019-05-22HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2019-05-15HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2019-05-15HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2019-05-15HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2019-05-15SenateRecord vote
2019-05-15SenatePassed
2019-05-15SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-15SenateRecord vote
2019-05-15SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-15SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-15SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-15SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-05-15SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2019-05-15SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-13SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-09SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-09SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-09SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-09SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-08SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-05-08SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-08SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-08SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-29SenateReferred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
2019-04-29SenateRead first time
2019-04-24SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-24HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-24HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-24HouseRecord vote RV#608
2019-04-24HousePassed
2019-04-24HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-23HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-23HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-23HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-18HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-16HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-15HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-15HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-09HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-09HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-02HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-02HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-02HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-02HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-27HouseReferred to Environmental Regulation
2019-02-27HouseRead first time
2019-02-04HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback