TX HB1362 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-22 - Placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-22 - Placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the caseloads of child protective services caseworkers.
Title
Relating to the caseloads of child protective services caseworkers.
Sponsors
Rep. Eugene Wu [D] | Rep. James Frank [R] | Rep. Gina Hinojosa [D] | Rep. Rick Miller [R] |
Rep. Armando Walle [D] | Rep. Ina Minjarez [D] | Rep. Lina Ortega [D] | Sen. Kirk Watson [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#938 (Y: 131 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-22 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-02 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-02 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-02 | House | Record vote RV#938 |
2019-05-02 | House | Passed |
2019-05-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-01 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-05-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-30 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-26 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-23 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-23 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-12 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-12 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-12 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-03-26 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2019-02-27 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-04 | House | Filed |