TX HB1364 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-23 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-23 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the age of a child at which a juvenile court may exercise jurisdiction over the child and to the minimum age of criminal responsibility.
Title
Relating to the age of a child at which a juvenile court may exercise jurisdiction over the child and to the minimum age of criminal responsibility.
Sponsors
Rep. Eugene Wu [D] | Rep. John Zerwas [R] | Rep. J.D. Sheffield [R] | Rep. Harold Dutton [D] |
Rep. James White [R] | Rep. Briscoe Cain [R] | Rep. Alex Dominguez [D] | Rep. Ina Minjarez [D] |
Rep. Erin Zwiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-18 - House - Amended RV#521 (Y: 98 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 23) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-22 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-18 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-18 | House | Record vote RV#521 |
2019-04-18 | House | Passed as amended |
2019-04-18 | House | Amended 1-Wu |
2019-04-18 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-17 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-04-17 | House | Amended 3-Wu |
2019-04-17 | House | Amended 2-Wu |
2019-04-17 | House | Amended 1-Wu |
2019-04-17 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2019-04-11 | House | Postponed 4/17/19 10:00 AM |
2019-04-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-11 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-02 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-01 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-20 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-03-20 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues |
2019-02-27 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-04 | House | Filed |