TX HB1367 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-06 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-06 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the disposition of real property intended for high-speed rail projects.
Title
Relating to the disposition of real property intended for high-speed rail projects.
Sponsors
Rep. Cody Harris [R] | Rep. Ben Leman [R] | Rep. Trent Ashby [R] | Rep. William Metcalf [R] |
Rep. Poncho Nevarez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-06 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-01 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-01 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-30 | House | Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm. |
2019-04-30 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-02 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-02 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to Land & Resource Management |
2019-02-27 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-05 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB659 (Same As) 2019-03-01 - Referred to Transportation
Subjects
Property Interests
Property Interests--Eminent Domain
Property Interests--Real Property
Transportation
Transportation--Mass Transit
Transportation--Railroads
Property Interests--Eminent Domain
Property Interests--Real Property
Transportation
Transportation--Mass Transit
Transportation--Railroads