TX HB1378 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of the Lubbock County Hospital District of Lubbock County, Texas, to employ and commission peace officers.
Title
Relating to the authority of the Lubbock County Hospital District of Lubbock County, Texas, to employ and commission peace officers.
Sponsors
Rep. John Frullo [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2019-04-29 | House | Companion considered in lieu of SB 319 |
2019-04-25 | House | Postponed 4/29/19 10:00 AM |
2019-04-25 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2019-04-23 | House | Postponed 4/25/19 10:00 AM |
2019-04-23 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2019-04-15 | House | Postponed 4/23/19 10:00 AM |
2019-04-15 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2019-04-09 | House | Postponed 4/15/19 12:00 PM |
2019-04-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-09 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-03 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-02 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-02 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-26 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-03-26 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-03-21 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-21 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-21 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2019-02-27 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-05 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB319 (Same As) 2019-05-14 - Effective immediately
Subjects
Law Enforcement
LUBBOCK COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT
PEACE OFFICERS
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Hospital
LUBBOCK COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT
PEACE OFFICERS
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Hospital
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1378 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01378I.htm |