TX HB1399 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation and storage of DNA records for a person arrested for certain felony offenses.
Title
Relating to the creation and storage of DNA records for a person arrested for certain felony offenses.
Sponsors
Rep. Reggie Smith [R] | Rep. Dade Phelan [R] | Rep. Joseph Moody [D] | Rep. Angie Button [R] |
Sen. Charles Creighton [R] | Sen. Paul Bettencourt [R] | Sen. Pat Fallon [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1880 (Y: 99 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#637 (Y: 77 N: 68 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - Point of order withdrawn RV#568 (Y: 91 N: 50 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#637 (Y: 77 N: 68 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - Point of order withdrawn RV#568 (Y: 91 N: 50 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-27 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-26 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-24 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2019-05-24 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2019-05-24 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-24 | House | Record vote RV#1880 |
2019-05-24 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2019-05-22 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Amended |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA2 Hughes |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Amended |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Creighton |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-24 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-24 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-24 | House | Record vote RV#637 |
2019-04-24 | House | Passed |
2019-04-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-23 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-23 | House | Record vote RV#568 |
2019-04-23 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-23 | House | Point of order withdrawn Rule 4, Section 32(c)(5) |
2019-04-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-23 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-18 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-11 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-11 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-11 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-03 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2019-02-27 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-05 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB1580 (Same As) 2019-03-04 - Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
Subjects
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Pretrial Procedure
DNA
KRYSTAL JEAN BAKER ACT
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Pretrial Procedure
DNA
KRYSTAL JEAN BAKER ACT
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF