TX HB1400 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-07 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-07 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to monthly reports on preservation, maintenance, and restoration expenses for the Alamo complex.
Title
Relating to monthly reports on preservation, maintenance, and restoration expenses for the Alamo complex.
Sponsors
Rep. Cole Hefner [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-06 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-23 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-23 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-02 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-02 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism |
2019-02-27 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-05 | House | Filed |
Subjects
ALAMO, THE
GENERAL LAND OFFICE
Historic Preservation & Museums
INTERNET
Public Lands, Buildings & Resources
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
GENERAL LAND OFFICE
Historic Preservation & Museums
INTERNET
Public Lands, Buildings & Resources
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control