TX HB1416 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to requirements for building construction contracts entered into by public school districts.
Title
Relating to requirements for building construction contracts entered into by public school districts.
Sponsors
Rep. Eddie Lucio [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-01 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-30 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-18 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-18 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-18 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2019-02-27 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1297 (Same As) 2019-05-10 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Subjects
BUILDING CONSTRUCTION
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Facilities
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--School Districts
FACILITIES COMMISSION, TEXAS
Purchasing
Purchasing--Local
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Facilities
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--School Districts
FACILITIES COMMISSION, TEXAS
Purchasing
Purchasing--Local