TX HB1418 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-27 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-27 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to disease prevention and preparedness information for emergency medical services personnel on certification or recertification.
Title
Relating to disease prevention and preparedness information for emergency medical services personnel on certification or recertification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#120 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#120 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-27 | Effective immediately | |
2019-05-27 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-17 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-16 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-15 | House | Senate passage reported |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-02 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-02 | House | Record vote RV#120 |
2019-04-02 | House | Passed |
2019-04-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-01 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-01 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-03-27 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-03-25 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-03-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-03-22 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-20 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-03-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2019-02-27 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB829 (Same As) 2019-03-01 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Subjects
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
IMMUNIZATIONS
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
IMMUNIZATIONS