TX HB1420 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-22 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-22 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the composition and duties of the Public Health Funding and Policy Committee.
Title
Relating to the composition and duties of the Public Health Funding and Policy Committee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-22 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-15 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-15 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-15 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-10 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-10 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2019-02-27 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed |
Subjects
BORDER
BORDER HEALTH OFFICIALS, TASK FORCE OF
BORDER HEALTH, OFFICE OF
Health
Health--General
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
BORDER HEALTH OFFICIALS, TASK FORCE OF
BORDER HEALTH, OFFICE OF
Health
Health--General
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF