TX HB1421 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to cybersecurity of voter registration lists and other election-related documents, systems, and technology.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to cybersecurity of voter registration lists and other election-related documents, systems, and technology.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1769 (Y: 115 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Read 3rd time RV#391 (Y: 121 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-29 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-26HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-25HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-23SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-23HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2019-05-23HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-23HouseRecord vote RV#1769
2019-05-23HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2019-05-21HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2019-05-21HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2019-05-21HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2019-05-20SenateRecord vote
2019-05-20SenatePassed
2019-05-20SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-20SenateRecord vote
2019-05-20SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-20SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-20SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-20SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-05-20SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-19SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2019-05-17SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-15SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-15SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-15SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-13SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-13SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-13SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-17SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-04-17SenateRead first time
2019-04-16SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-16HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-16HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-16HouseRecord vote RV#391
2019-04-16HousePassed
2019-04-16HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-15HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-15HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-15HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-11HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-03-27HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-03-22HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-03-22HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-03-21HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-18HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-03-18HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-18HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-11HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-11HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-11HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-11HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-27HouseReferred to Elections
2019-02-27HouseRead first time
2019-02-06HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback