TX HB1439 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-27 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-27 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the intercollegiate athletics fee at Texas A&M University--San Antonio; authorizing a fee.
Title
Relating to the intercollegiate athletics fee at Texas A&M University--San Antonio; authorizing a fee.
Sponsors
Rep. Leo Pacheco [D] | Rep. Ina Minjarez [D] | Rep. Diego Bernal [D] | Rep. Stephen Allison [R] |
Rep. Ryan Guillen [R] | Rep. Philip Cortez [D] | Sen. Peter Flores [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - Read 3rd time RV#752 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - Read 3rd time RV#752 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-27 | Effective immediately | |
2019-05-27 | Filed without the Governor's signature | |
2019-05-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-17 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-17 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-15 | House | Senate passage reported |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-26 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-26 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-26 | House | Record vote RV#752 |
2019-04-26 | House | Passed |
2019-04-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-26 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-26 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-26 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-04-23 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-04-17 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-04-16 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-16 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-10 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-10 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-04-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-03 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2019-02-27 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB399 (Same As) 2019-04-17 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Athletics
Education--Higher--Student Fees
TEXAS A&M UNIVERSITY
TEXAS A&M UNIVERSITY SYSTEM
TEXAS A&M UNIVERSITY--SAN ANTONIO
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Athletics
Education--Higher--Student Fees
TEXAS A&M UNIVERSITY
TEXAS A&M UNIVERSITY SYSTEM
TEXAS A&M UNIVERSITY--SAN ANTONIO