TX HB1443 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-27 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-27 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the certification of an area's wet or dry status for the purpose of an alcoholic beverage permit or license.
Title
Relating to the certification of an area's wet or dry status for the purpose of an alcoholic beverage permit or license.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - Read 3rd time RV#752 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - Read 3rd time RV#752 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-27 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-05-27 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-17 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-16 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-15 | House | Senate passage reported |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-26 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-26 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-26 | House | Record vote RV#752 |
2019-04-26 | House | Passed |
2019-04-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-26 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-26 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-26 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-04-23 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-04-15 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-04-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-12 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-11 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-11 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-04-11 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures |
2019-02-27 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB699 (Same As) 2019-04-30 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
ALCOHOLIC BEVERAGE COMMISSION, TEXAS
Alcoholic Beverage Regulation
City Government
City Government--General
PERMITS
Alcoholic Beverage Regulation
City Government
City Government--General
PERMITS