TX HB1446 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 21-2)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-25 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-25 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to use of an electric cooperative's easements or property for broadband service.
Title
Relating to use of an electric cooperative's easements or property for broadband service.
Sponsors
Rep. John Kuempel [R] | Rep. Trent Ashby [R] | Rep. Keith Bell [R] | Sen. Phil King [R] |
Rep. Four Price [R] | Rep. Cecil Bell [R] | Rep. Brad Buckley [R] | Rep. Travis Clardy [R] |
Rep. John Cyrier [R] | Rep. Drew Darby [R] | Rep. Jay Dean [R] | Rep. Dan Flynn [R] |
Rep. Mary Gonzalez [D] | Rep. Cody Harris [R] | Rep. Celia Israel [D] | Rep. Kyle Kacal [R] |
Rep. Ken King [R] | Rep. Stan Lambert [R] | Rep. Ben Leman [R] | Rep. Geanie Morrison [R] |
Rep. J.D. Sheffield [R] | Rep. Reggie Smith [R] | Sen. Drew Springer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-25 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-02-27 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB14 (Same As) 2019-06-07 - Effective immediately
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1446 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01446I.htm |