TX HB1452 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the date on which certain persons placed on deferred adjudication community supervision are eligible to file a petition for an order of nondisclosure of criminal history record information.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the date on which certain persons placed on deferred adjudication community supervision are eligible to file a petition for an order of nondisclosure of criminal history record information.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-18 - House - Read 3rd time RV#536 (Y: 120 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 18) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2019-04-24SenateRead first time
2019-04-23SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-18HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-18HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-18HouseRecord vote RV#536
2019-04-18HousePassed
2019-04-18HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-17HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-17HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-04-17HouseAmended 1-Moody and Toth
2019-04-17HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-17HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-15HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-11HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-10HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-09HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-09HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-08HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-08HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-03-21HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-21HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-21HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-21HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-27HouseReferred to Corrections
2019-02-27HouseRead first time
2019-02-06HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1360 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - Referred to Criminal Justice

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback