TX HB1456 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-26 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-26 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the appointment of counsel to represent an indigent person in certain criminal proceedings.
Title
Relating to the appointment of counsel to represent an indigent person in certain criminal proceedings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-26 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-25 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-16 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2019-02-27 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Courts
Courts--General
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Pretrial Procedure
INDIGENT LEGAL SERVICES
Lawyers
Courts--General
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Pretrial Procedure
INDIGENT LEGAL SERVICES
Lawyers
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1456 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01456I.htm |