TX HB1463 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to procedures for actions alleging failure to comply with certain standards to accommodate persons with disabilities.
Title
Relating to procedures for actions alleging failure to comply with certain standards to accommodate persons with disabilities.
Sponsors
Rep. John Smithee [R] | Rep. Jason Villalba [R] | Rep. Charles Anderson [R] | Sen. Pat Fallon [R] |
Rep. Charlie Geren [R] | Rep. Jeff Leach [R] | Rep. John Wray [R] | Sen. Kel Seliger [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#969 (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#969 (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-01 | Effective on 9/1/17 | |
2017-06-01 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-23 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-22 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-20 | House | Senate passage reported |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-07 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-06 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-06 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-06 | House | Passed |
2017-05-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-05 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-05 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-05-05 | House | Amended |
2017-05-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-05 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-02 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-25 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-24 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-18 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-18 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-28 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-28 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-28 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-03-28 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-28 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-07 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2017-03-07 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-01 | House | Filed |
Subjects
AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT
ATTORNEY GENERAL
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
Disabilities, Persons with
ATTORNEY GENERAL
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
Disabilities, Persons with