TX HB1469 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-13 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Pending: Senate Natural Resources & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-13 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Pending: Senate Natural Resources & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain public school workforce training programs funded by the skills development fund and to authorizing school districts to reimburse under the Foundation School Program private employers for paid internships provided to certain students in career and technology education programs in the district.
Title
Relating to certain public school workforce training programs funded by the skills development fund and to authorizing school districts to reimburse under the Foundation School Program private employers for paid internships provided to certain students in career and technology education programs in the district.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-08 - House - Amended RV#1109 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-08 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-08 | House | Record vote RV#1109 |
2019-05-08 | House | Passed as amended |
2019-05-08 | House | Amended 1-Thierry |
2019-05-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-07 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-05-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-06 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-03 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-29 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-15 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-15 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-01 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to International Relations & Economic Development |
2019-02-27 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB1472 (Same As) 2019-02-27 - Referred to International Relations & Economic Development
SB1724 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
SB1724 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Junior College Districts
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
Education--School Districts
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Labor
Labor--Workforce Development
TEXAS A&M ENGINEERING EXTENSION SERVICE
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Junior College Districts
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
Education--School Districts
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Labor
Labor--Workforce Development
TEXAS A&M ENGINEERING EXTENSION SERVICE
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS