TX HB1472 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-27 - Referred to International Relations & Economic Development
Pending: House International Relations & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-27 - Referred to International Relations & Economic Development
Pending: House International Relations & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain public school workforce training programs funded by the skills development fund.
Title
Relating to certain public school workforce training programs funded by the skills development fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to International Relations & Economic Development |
2019-02-27 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB1469 (Same As) 2019-05-13 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
SB1724 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
SB1724 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Junior College Districts
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
Education--School Districts
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
TEXAS A&M ENGINEERING EXTENSION SERVICE
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Junior College Districts
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
Education--School Districts
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
TEXAS A&M ENGINEERING EXTENSION SERVICE
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1472 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01472I.htm |