TX HB1494 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to surety bonds for deputy clerks and other employees of county and district clerks.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to surety bonds for deputy clerks and other employees of county and district clerks.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - Read 3rd time RV#727 (Y: 134 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-05-24 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-14 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-14SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-13HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-10HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-10HouseSenate passage reported
2019-05-10SenateRecord vote
2019-05-10SenatePassed
2019-05-10SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-10SenateRecord vote
2019-05-10SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-10SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-10SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-10SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-05-10SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-03SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-03SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-03SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-01SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-01SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-29SenateReferred to Administration
2019-04-29SenateRead first time
2019-04-26SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-26HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-25HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-25HouseRecord vote RV#727
2019-04-25HousePassed
2019-04-25HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-24HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-24HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-24HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-18HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-17HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-17HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-16HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-03HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-03HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-03HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-03-25HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-25HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-25HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-25HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-25HousePosting rule suspended
2019-03-25HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-27HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2019-02-27HouseRead first time
2019-02-07HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1763 (Similar To) 2019-04-26 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback