TX HB1496 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-30 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-30 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a notice requirement regarding possible acts of school violence.
Title
Relating to a notice requirement regarding possible acts of school violence.
Sponsors
Rep. William Metcalf [R] | Rep. Alma Allen [D] | Rep. Greg Bonnen [R] | Rep. Dan Huberty [R] |
Rep. Harold Dutton [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-26 - House - Read 3rd time RV#752 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-26 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-26 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-26 | House | Record vote RV#752 |
2019-04-26 | House | Passed |
2019-04-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-26 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-26 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-26 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-04-23 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-04-15 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-04-12 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-12 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-09 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-09 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-26 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2019-02-27 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-07 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Juvenile
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
EDUCATION--PRIMARY & SECONDARY--VIOLENCE
Minors
Minors--Juvenile Justice
Safety
Crimes--Juvenile
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
EDUCATION--PRIMARY & SECONDARY--VIOLENCE
Minors
Minors--Juvenile Justice
Safety