TX HB1502 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-09 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-09 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the Lower Colorado River Authority, following recommendations of the Sunset Advisory Commission.
Title
Relating to the Lower Colorado River Authority, following recommendations of the Sunset Advisory Commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2019-03-04 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB606 (Same As) 2019-05-07 - Effective on 9/1/19
Subjects
LOWER COLORADO RIVER AUTHORITY
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
SUNSET ADVISORY COMMISSION
Sunset—Required Reviews
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
SUNSET ADVISORY COMMISSION
Sunset—Required Reviews
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1502 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01502I.htm |