TX HB1506 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to authorizing a regulatory authority to establish reduced water and sewer utility rates funded by donations for the benefit of certain low-income customers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to authorizing a regulatory authority to establish reduced water and sewer utility rates funded by donations for the benefit of certain low-income customers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#209 (Y: 123 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-22SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-20SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-30SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-30SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-04-29SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-29SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-15SenateReferred to Water & Rural Affairs
2019-04-15SenateRead first time
2019-04-11SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-09HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-09HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-09HouseRecord vote RV#209
2019-04-09HousePassed
2019-04-09HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-08HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-08HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-08HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-08HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-05HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-02HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-01HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-01HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-26HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-03-26HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-12HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-12HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-12HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-12HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-04HouseReferred to Natural Resources
2019-03-04HouseRead first time
2019-02-07HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1694 (Same As) 2019-04-08 - Left pending in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback