TX HB1507 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-09 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Environmental Regulation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-09 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Environmental Regulation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to programs that can be established and funded under the Texas emissions reduction plan.
Title
Relating to programs that can be established and funded under the Texas emissions reduction plan.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred to Environmental Regulation |
2019-03-04 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB765 (Same As) 2019-03-01 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Subjects
Energy
Energy--Alternative Fuels
Environment
Environment--Air
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
State Finances--Management & Control
VEHICLE EMISSIONS
Energy--Alternative Fuels
Environment
Environment--Air
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
State Finances--Management & Control
VEHICLE EMISSIONS
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1507 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01507I.htm |