TX HB1543 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-02 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-02 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to methods to enhance the enforcement of the collection of the use tax due on certain off-highway vehicles purchased outside this state; providing a civil penalty.
Title
Relating to methods to enhance the enforcement of the collection of the use tax due on certain off-highway vehicles purchased outside this state; providing a civil penalty.
Sponsors
Sen. Drew Springer [R] | Rep. James Frank [R] | Rep. Dan Flynn [R] | Rep. Matt Schaefer [R] |
Rep. Chris Paddie [R] | Sen. Pat Fallon [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - Read 3rd time RV#802 (Y: 129 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - Amended RV#781 (Y: 126 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - Read 3rd time RV#802 (Y: 129 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - Amended RV#781 (Y: 126 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-02 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-06-02 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-21 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-20 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-17 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-17 | House | Senate passage reported |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-30 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-30 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-30 | House | Record vote RV#802 |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed |
2019-04-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-29 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-29 | House | Record vote RV#781 |
2019-04-29 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-04-29 | House | Amended 1-Springer |
2019-04-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-25 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-23 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-15 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-12 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-03 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-03 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2019-03-04 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-08 | House | Filed |
Subjects
ATTORNEY GENERAL
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
COUNTY TAX ASSESSOR-COLLECTORS
MOTOR VEHICLES, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
MOTORCYCLES
RECREATIONAL & ALL-TERRAIN VEHICLES
Taxation
Taxation--General
Taxation--Sales
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
COUNTY TAX ASSESSOR-COLLECTORS
MOTOR VEHICLES, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
MOTORCYCLES
RECREATIONAL & ALL-TERRAIN VEHICLES
Taxation
Taxation--General
Taxation--Sales
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration