TX HB1548 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the operation of golf carts, neighborhood electric vehicles, and off-highway vehicles; authorizing fees.
Title
Relating to the operation of golf carts, neighborhood electric vehicles, and off-highway vehicles; authorizing fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1848 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Amended RV#894 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Amended RV#894 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | Effective immediately | |
2019-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-26 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-25 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-24 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2019-05-24 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2019-05-24 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-24 | House | Record vote RV#1848 |
2019-05-24 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-02 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-02 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-02 | House | Record vote RV#894 |
2019-05-02 | House | Passed as amended |
2019-05-02 | House | Amended 1-Springer |
2019-05-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-01 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-05-01 | House | Amended 1-Springer |
2019-05-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-29 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-25 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-15 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-12 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-04 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-03-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2019-03-04 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-08 | House | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Roads
County Government
County Government--Roads
Highways
LICENSE PLATES
MOTOR VEHICLES, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
RECREATIONAL & ALL-TERRAIN VEHICLES
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Equipment
Vehicles & Traffic--Rules of Road
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration
City Government--Roads
County Government
County Government--Roads
Highways
LICENSE PLATES
MOTOR VEHICLES, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
RECREATIONAL & ALL-TERRAIN VEHICLES
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Equipment
Vehicles & Traffic--Rules of Road
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration