TX HB1566 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the definition of economically disadvantaged person for the purposes of determining whether a business is a historically underutilized business.
Title
Relating to the definition of economically disadvantaged person for the purposes of determining whether a business is a historically underutilized business.
Sponsors
Rep. Terry Meza [D] | Rep. Angie Button [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-24 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-15 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-15 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-15 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-03-04 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-11 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--Small Business & Minority Business
HISTORICALLY UNDERUTILIZED BUSINESSES
Purchasing
Purchasing--State
Business & Commerce--Small Business & Minority Business
HISTORICALLY UNDERUTILIZED BUSINESSES
Purchasing
Purchasing--State