TX HB1576 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the delivery of certain transportation services under Medicaid and certain other health and human services programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the delivery of certain transportation services under Medicaid and certain other health and human services programs.

Sponsors

Rep. Dade Phelan [R]Rep. Chris Paddie [R]Rep. Drew Springer [R]Rep. Mary Gonzalez [D]
Rep. Toni Rose [D]Rep. Stephen Allison [R]Rep. Rafael Anchia [D]Rep. Trent Ashby [R]
Rep. Ernest Bailes [R]Rep. Cecil Bell [R]Rep. Keith Bell [R]Rep. Diego Bernal [D]
Rep. Kyle Biedermann [R]Rep. Cesar Blanco [D]Rep. Dwayne Bohac [R]Rep. Greg Bonnen [R]
Rep. Rhetta Bowers [D]Rep. Brad Buckley [R]Rep. John Bucy [D]Rep. Dewayne Burns [R]
Rep. Dustin Burrows [R]Rep. Angie Button [R]Rep. Briscoe Cain [R]Rep. Gina Calanni [D]
Rep. Terry Canales [D]Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R]Rep. Travis Clardy [R]Rep. Sheryl Cole [D]
Rep. Nicole Collier [D]Rep. Philip Cortez [D]Rep. John Cyrier [R]Rep. Drew Darby [R]
Rep. Jay Dean [R]Rep. Joe Deshotel [D]Rep. Alex Dominguez [D]Rep. Harold Dutton [D]
Rep. Jessica Farrar [D]Rep. Dan Flynn [R]Rep. John Frullo [R]Rep. Charlie Geren [R]
Rep. Barbara Gervin-Hawkins [D]Rep. Craig Goldman [R]Rep. Jessica Gonzalez [D]Rep. Vikki Goodwin [D]
Rep. Robert Guerra [D]Rep. Ryan Guillen [D]Rep. Roland Gutierrez [D]Rep. Sam Harless [R]
Rep. Cody Harris [R]Rep. Cole Hefner [R]Rep. Ana Hernandez [D]Rep. Abel Herrero [D]
Rep. Gina Hinojosa [D]Rep. Justin Holland [R]Rep. Donna Howard [D]Rep. Dan Huberty [R]
Rep. Todd Hunter [R]Rep. Celia Israel [D]Rep. Julie Johnson [D]Rep. Kyle Kacal [R]
Rep. Ken King [R]Rep. Stephanie Klick [R]Rep. Matt Krause [R]Rep. John Kuempel [R]
Rep. Stan Lambert [R]Rep. Brooks Landgraf [R]Rep. Mike Lang [R]Rep. Lyle Larson [R]
Rep. Jeff Leach [R]Rep. Ben Leman [R]Rep. Oscar Longoria [D]Rep. J.M. Lozano [R]
Rep. Armando Martinez [D]Rep. Trey Martinez Fischer [D]Rep. William Metcalf [R]Rep. Morgan Meyer [R]
Rep. Terry Meza [D]Rep. Mayes Middleton [R]Rep. Rick Miller [R]Rep. Ina Minjarez [D]
Rep. Joseph Moody [D]Rep. Sergio Munoz [D]Rep. Jim Murphy [R]Rep. Andrew Murr [R]
Rep. Victoria Neave [D]Rep. Poncho Nevarez [D]Rep. Candy Noble [R]Rep. Tom Oliverson [R]
Rep. Lina Ortega [D]Rep. Leo Pacheco [D]Rep. Tan Parker [R]Rep. Jared Patterson [R]
Rep. Dennis Paul [R]Rep. Mary Perez [D]Rep. Four Price [R]Rep. John Raney [R]
Rep. Richard Raymond [D]Rep. Ron Reynolds [D]Rep. Justin Rodriguez [D]Rep. Ramon Romero [D]
Rep. Jon Rosenthal [D]Rep. Scott Sanford [R]Rep. Matt Schaefer [R]Rep. Matthew Shaheen [R]
Rep. J.D. Sheffield [R]Rep. Carl Sherman [D]Rep. Hugh Shine [R]Rep. John Smithee [R]
Rep. Phil Stephenson [R]Rep. Jonathan Stickland [R]Rep. Lynn Stucky [R]Rep. Valoree Swanson [R]
Rep. James Talarico [D]Rep. Shawn Thierry [D]Rep. Ed Thompson [R]Rep. Senfronia Thompson [D]
Rep. Tony Tinderholt [R]Rep. Steve Toth [R]Rep. Chris Turner [D]Rep. James White [R]
Rep. Terry Wilson [R]Rep. John Wray [R]Rep. Eugene Wu [D]Rep. William Zedler [R]
Rep. Erin Zwiener [D]Sen. Dawn Buckingham [R]Sen. Carol Alvarado [D]Sen. Donna Campbell [R]
Sen. Joan Huffman [R]Sen. Beverly Powell [D]Sen. Charles Schwertner [R]

Roll Calls

2019-05-24 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1864 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - Read 3rd time RV#700 (Y: 133 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - 1-Phelan RV#649 (Y: 123 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14 Effective immediately
2019-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-29 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-27HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-26HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-24SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-24HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2019-05-24HouseRecord vote RV#1864
2019-05-24HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2019-05-23HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2019-05-23HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2019-05-23HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenatePassed
2019-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2019-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22SenateAmended
2019-05-22SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Buckingham
2019-05-22SenateRead 2nd time
2019-05-22SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-22SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2019-05-22SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-21SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-21SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-19SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-19SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-07SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-05-07SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-07SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-07SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-06SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-03SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-04-29SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2019-04-29SenateRead first time
2019-04-26SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-26HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-25HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-25HouseRecord vote RV#700
2019-04-25HousePassed
2019-04-25HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-24HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-04-24HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-24HouseRecord vote RV#649
2019-04-24HouseAmended 2-Paddie
2019-04-24HouseAmended 1-Phelan
2019-04-24HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-24HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-18HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-12HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-11HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-11HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-02HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-02HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-02HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-19HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-19HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-19HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-19HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-04HouseReferred to Human Services
2019-03-04HouseRead first time
2019-02-11HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1667 (Same As) 2019-04-25 - Co-author authorized

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1576
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01576I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01576H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01576E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01576S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01576F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1576&RcdVtNo=649&Ch=H&Dt=04/24/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1576&RcdVtNo=700&Ch=H&Dt=04/25/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1576&RcdVtNo=1864&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2019
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-22-F.PDF#page=129

Bill Comments

feedback