TX HB1584 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Passed on June 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Passed on June 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to health benefit plan coverage of prescription drugs for stage-four advanced, metastatic cancer.
Title
Relating to health benefit plan coverage of prescription drugs for stage-four advanced, metastatic cancer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1858 (Y: 115 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-07 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1068 (Y: 126 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-07 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1068 (Y: 126 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-15 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-06-15 | Filed without the Governor's signature | |
2019-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-27 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-26 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-24 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2019-05-24 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2019-05-24 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-24 | House | Record vote RV#1858 |
2019-05-24 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Amended |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Buckingham |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-07 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-07 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-07 | House | Record vote RV#1068 |
2019-05-07 | House | Passed |
2019-05-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-06 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-05-06 | House | Amended 1-S. Thompson |
2019-05-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-06 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-03 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-23 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-23 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-16 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-16 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-02 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-02 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2019-03-04 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-11 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1148 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Subjects
CANCER
Health
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
Health
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS