TX HB1589 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to providing notification to certain pregnant women regarding their eligibility for coverage under Medicaid and the Healthy Texas Women program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to providing notification to certain pregnant women regarding their eligibility for coverage under Medicaid and the Healthy Texas Women program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-17 - House - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal RV#503 (Y: 144 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - Vote reconsidered RV#502 (Y: 131 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - Failed to pass RV#454 (Y: 68 N: 73 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-07SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2019-05-07SenateRead first time
2019-04-23SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-17HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-17HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-17HouseRecord vote RV#503
2019-04-17HousePassed
2019-04-17HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-17HouseRecord vote RV#502
2019-04-17HouseVote reconsidered
2019-04-17House1 hr. notice-for reconsideration
2019-04-17HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-17HouseRecord vote RV#454
2019-04-17HouseFailed to pass
2019-04-17HouseAmendment withdrawn 1-Howard
2019-04-17HousePoint of order withdrawn (amendment)
2019-04-17HouseAmendment(s) offered 1-Howard
2019-04-17HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-16HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-16HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-16HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-12HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-02HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-03-29HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-03-29HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-03-28HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-25HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-03-25HouseVote reconsidered in committee
2019-03-25HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-03-18HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-03-18HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2019-03-18HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-03-13HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-13HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-13HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-13HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-04HouseReferred to Public Health
2019-03-04HouseRead first time
2019-02-11HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback