TX HB16 | 2013 | 83rd Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Introduced on May 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-24 - Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-24 - Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to abortion at or after 20 weeks post-fertilization.
Title
Relating to abortion at or after 20 weeks post-fertilization.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-23 - House - HB 16Third Reading House (Y: 91 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 24) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-24 | House | Postponed |
2013-06-24 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2013-06-23 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-06-23 | House | Record vote |
2013-06-23 | House | Postponed |
2013-06-23 | House | Point of order overruled |
2013-06-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-06-23 | House | Placed on Major State Calendar |
2013-06-21 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-06-21 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-06-21 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-06-21 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-06-21 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-06-21 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-06-21 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-06-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-06-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-06-20 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-06-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-06-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-06-17 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2013-06-17 | House | Read first time |
2013-05-28 | House | Filed |