TX HB16 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 87-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the enforcement of the rights of a living unborn child after an abortion; providing a civil penalty; creating a criminal offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the enforcement of the rights of a living unborn child after an abortion; providing a civil penalty; creating a criminal offense.

Sponsors

Rep. Jeff Leach [R]Rep. Greg Bonnen [R]Rep. Stephanie Klick [R]Rep. Tom Oliverson [R]
Rep. Geanie Morrison [R]Rep. Stephen Allison [R]Rep. Charles Anderson [R]Rep. Trent Ashby [R]
Rep. Ernest Bailes [R]Rep. Cecil Bell [R]Rep. Keith Bell [R]Rep. Kyle Biedermann [R]
Rep. Dwayne Bohac [R]Rep. Brad Buckley [R]Rep. Dewayne Burns [R]Rep. Dustin Burrows [R]
Rep. Angie Button [R]Rep. Briscoe Cain [R]Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R]Rep. Travis Clardy [R]
Rep. John Cyrier [R]Rep. Drew Darby [R]Rep. Jay Dean [R]Rep. Dan Flynn [R]
Rep. James Frank [R]Rep. John Frullo [R]Rep. Charlie Geren [R]Rep. Craig Goldman [R]
Rep. Sam Harless [R]Rep. Cody Harris [R]Rep. Cole Hefner [R]Rep. Justin Holland [R]
Rep. Dan Huberty [R]Rep. Todd Hunter [R]Rep. Kyle Kacal [R]Rep. Ken King [R]
Rep. Phil King [R]Rep. Matt Krause [R]Rep. John Kuempel [R]Rep. Stan Lambert [R]
Rep. Brooks Landgraf [R]Rep. Mike Lang [R]Rep. Lyle Larson [R]Rep. Ben Leman [R]
Rep. J.M. Lozano [R]Rep. William Metcalf [R]Rep. Morgan Meyer [R]Rep. Mayes Middleton [R]
Rep. Rick Miller [R]Rep. Jim Murphy [R]Rep. Andrew Murr [R]Rep. Candy Noble [R]
Rep. Leo Pacheco [D]Rep. Chris Paddie [R]Rep. Tan Parker [R]Rep. Jared Patterson [R]
Rep. Dennis Paul [R]Rep. Dade Phelan [R]Rep. Four Price [R]Rep. John Raney [R]
Rep. Scott Sanford [R]Rep. Matt Schaefer [R]Rep. Matthew Shaheen [R]Rep. J.D. Sheffield [R]
Rep. Hugh Shine [R]Rep. Reggie Smith [R]Rep. John Smithee [R]Rep. Drew Springer [R]
Rep. Phil Stephenson [R]Rep. Jonathan Stickland [R]Rep. Lynn Stucky [R]Rep. Valoree Swanson [R]
Rep. Ed Thompson [R]Rep. Tony Tinderholt [R]Rep. Steve Toth [R]Rep. Gary Vandeaver [R]
Rep. James White [R]Rep. Terry Wilson [R]Rep. John Wray [R]Rep. William Zedler [R]
Rep. John Zerwas [R]Sen. Lois Kolkhorst [R]Sen. Paul Bettencourt [R]Sen. Donna Campbell [R]
Sen. Bob Hall [R]Sen. Jane Nelson [R]Sen. Angela Paxton [R]Sen. Charles Schwertner [R]

Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1727 (Y: 84 N: 57 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - Read 3rd time RV#493 (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 49 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Read 2nd time RV#437 (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 50 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-29 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-26HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-25HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-23SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-23HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2019-05-23HouseRecord vote RV#1727
2019-05-23HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2019-05-17HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2019-05-17HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2019-05-17HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2019-05-16SenateRecord vote
2019-05-16SenatePassed
2019-05-16SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-16SenateRecord vote
2019-05-16SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-16SenateRecord vote
2019-05-16SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2019-05-16SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-16SenateAmended
2019-05-16SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Rodríguez
2019-05-16SenateRead 2nd time
2019-05-16SenateRecord vote
2019-05-16SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-16SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-15SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-15SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-14SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-13SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-13SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-10SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-07SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-05-07SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-07SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-07SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-07SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-04-25SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2019-04-25SenateRead first time
2019-04-23SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-17HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-17HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-17HouseRecord vote RV#493
2019-04-17HousePassed
2019-04-17HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-16HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-16HouseRecord vote RV#437
2019-04-16HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-16HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-16HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-12HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-11HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-09HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-08HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-08HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-01HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-01HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-01HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-25HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-25HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-25HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-25HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-25HousePosting rule suspended
2019-03-25HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-11HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2019-03-11HouseRead first time
2019-03-07HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB23 (Similar To) 2019-04-23 - Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB16
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00016I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00016H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00016E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00016S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00016F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB16&RcdVtNo=437&Ch=H&Dt=04/16/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB16&RcdVtNo=493&Ch=H&Dt=04/17/2019
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-16-F.PDF#page=18
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-16-F.PDF#page=19
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-16-F.PDF#page=21
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB16&RcdVtNo=1727&Ch=H&Dt=05/23/2019

Bill Comments

feedback