TX HB1620 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-03 - Companion considered in lieu of in committee
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-03 - Companion considered in lieu of in committee
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to legislative oversight of deferred maintenance projects.
Title
Relating to legislative oversight of deferred maintenance projects.
Sponsors
Rep. John Cyrier [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | House | Companion considered in lieu of in committee |
2019-03-25 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred to House Administration |
2019-03-04 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB401 (Same As) 2019-06-04 - Effective immediately
Subjects
GOVERNMENT FACILITIES, JOINT OVERSIGHT COMMITTEE ON
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
Public Lands, Buildings & Resources
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
Public Lands, Buildings & Resources
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1620 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01620I.htm |