TX HB1629 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-26 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-26 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the right to vacate and avoid residential lease liability following the occurrence of family violence.
Title
Relating to the right to vacate and avoid residential lease liability following the occurrence of family violence.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-26 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2019-04-26 | House | Companion considered in lieu of SB 234 |
2019-04-26 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-04-23 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-04-05 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-04-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-26 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-03-26 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-03-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-12 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-12 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-12 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred to Business & Industry |
2019-03-04 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB234 (Same As) 2019-05-07 - Effective on 9/1/19
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
Family
Family--Family Violence
Property Interests
Property Interests--Landlord & Tenant
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
Family
Family--Family Violence
Property Interests
Property Interests--Landlord & Tenant