TX HB1637 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-06 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-06 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to required training regarding trauma-informed care for certain judges and attorneys.
Title
Relating to required training regarding trauma-informed care for certain judges and attorneys.
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Miller [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-03 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-25 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-25 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-23 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-23 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-23 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-23 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2019-03-04 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-12 | House | Filed |
Subjects
CONTINUING EDUCATION
Courts
Courts--Judges
Family
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection
Lawyers
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING
SUPREME COURT
Courts
Courts--Judges
Family
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection
Lawyers
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING
SUPREME COURT