TX HB1641 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the provision of information to certain women enrolled in the Healthy Texas Women program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the provision of information to certain women enrolled in the Healthy Texas Women program.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseLaid on the table subject to call
2019-05-03HouseCompanion considered in lieu of SB 2132
2019-05-03HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2019-04-30HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2019-04-18HouseReturned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
2019-04-18HouseWithdrawn from calendar (by author)
2019-04-18HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2019-04-15HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2019-04-11HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2019-04-10HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-10HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-08HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-08HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2019-04-08HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-03-20HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-20HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-20HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-20HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-04HouseReferred to Public Health
2019-03-04HouseRead first time
2019-02-12HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB2132 (Same As) 2019-05-20 - Effective immediately

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback