TX HB1649 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-22 - Placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-22 - Placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the amount of and vehicles eligible for the light-duty motor vehicle purchase or lease incentive program.
Title
Relating to the amount of and vehicles eligible for the light-duty motor vehicle purchase or lease incentive program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#941 (Y: 107 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - Amended RV#868 (Y: 99 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - Amended RV#868 (Y: 99 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-22 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-02 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-02 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-02 | House | Record vote RV#941 |
2019-05-02 | House | Passed |
2019-05-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-01 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-01 | House | Record vote RV#868 |
2019-05-01 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-05-01 | House | Amended 2-Murphy |
2019-05-01 | House | Amended 1-Springer |
2019-05-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-30 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-26 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-02 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-03-26 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-03-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-03-25 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-20 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-03-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred to Environmental Regulation |
2019-03-04 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB486 (Same As) 2019-03-20 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
Environment
Environment--Air
MOTORCYCLES
VEHICLE EMISSIONS
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Environment--Air
MOTORCYCLES
VEHICLE EMISSIONS
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General