TX HB1660 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-03 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-03 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to peace officer training on recognizing and recording circumstances that indicate strangulation in certain cases.
Title
Relating to peace officer training on recognizing and recording circumstances that indicate strangulation in certain cases.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2019-05-03 | House | Companion considered in lieu of SB 971 |
2019-05-03 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-04-30 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-04-26 | House | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. |
2019-04-26 | House | Withdrawn from calendar (by author) |
2019-04-26 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-04-23 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-04-17 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-04-16 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-16 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-10 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-10 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-04-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2019-03-04 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB971 (Same As) 2019-05-20 - Effective on 9/1/19
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
Law Enforcement
LAW ENFORCEMENT, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
Law Enforcement
LAW ENFORCEMENT, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING