TX HB1663 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-12 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Business & Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-12 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Business & Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the right to vacate and avoid residential lease liability following the occurrence of family violence.
Title
Relating to the right to vacate and avoid residential lease liability following the occurrence of family violence.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-12 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-12 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-12 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred to Business & Industry |
2019-03-04 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB234 (Same As) 2019-05-07 - Effective on 9/1/19
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
Family
Family--Family Violence
Property Interests
Property Interests--Landlord & Tenant
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
Family
Family--Family Violence
Property Interests
Property Interests--Landlord & Tenant
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1663 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01663I.htm |